This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 23:21:00 (UTC).

600 East 21st Street L.L.C. vs. Wright, Janice New York City Housing Authority

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 600 East 21st Street L L C filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Wright, Janice New York City Housing Authority. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

600 East 21st Street L.L.C.

Respondents

Janice Wright

New York City Housing Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Slochowsky & Slochowsky LLP

Attorney at Slochowsky & Slochowsky LLP

26 Court Street Suite 304

Brooklyn, NY 11242

Respondent Attorneys

South Brooklyn Legal Services

Attorney at South Brooklyn Legal Services

360 Fulton Street

Brooklyn, NY 11216

NYCHA - Law Department

Attorney at NYCHA - Law Department

250 Broadway

New York, NY 10007

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G- UA2; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kimberley Slade Part G- UA2; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G- UA2; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G- UA2; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas Michael Fitzpatrick Part G- UA2; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G- UA2; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G- UA2; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G- UA2; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, No Stay/Issuance Forthwith, Execution Stayed, Earliest Execution Date 09/24/2019; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G- UA2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less