This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/22/2020 at 07:46:18 (UTC).

3419 14 Avenue LLC vs. Ruiz, Maria

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 3419 14 Avenue LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Ruiz, Maria. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Kenneth T. Barany. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Kenneth T. Barany

 

Party Details

Petitioner

3419 14 Avenue LLC

Respondent

Maria Ruiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Stephen Luke Dilorenzo

9 East 40Th Street Fourth Floor

New York, NY 10016

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Kenneth T. Barany Part E; Motion Seq: 005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kenneth T. Barany Part E; Motion Seq: 005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Denied; Judge Part: Honorable Kenneth T. Barany Part E; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 005; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Denied Before Judge: Honorable Kenneth T. Barany

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Denied; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Denied Before Judge: Honorable Zhuo Wang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Zhuo Wang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Zhuo Wang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, no Warrant; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less