This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 10:24:59 (UTC).

33 Bond St. (LIHTC) LLC, vs. Beamon, Lisa "Doe", "John" "Doe", "Jane"

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 33 Bond St LIHTC LLC, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Beamon, Lisa Doe , John Doe , Jane. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Kenneth T. Barany. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Kenneth T. Barany

 

Party Details

Petitioner

33 Bond St. (LIHTC) LLC,

Respondents

"John" "Doe"

"Jane" "Doe"

Lisa Beamon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman LLP

Attorney at Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman LLP

270 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Kenneth T. Barany Part E; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kenneth T. Barany Part E; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Kenneth T. Barany Part E; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part E; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Guardian Ad Litem; Nature of Decision/Judge: Complex - Decision on file Before Judge: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kenneth T. Barany Part E; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Guardian Ad Litem

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Zhuo Wang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Default; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Restore to Calendar; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Default Before Judge: Honorable Zhuo Wang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Settled Stip in File; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less