This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 12/29/2020 at 20:15:35 (UTC).

1229-1273 Realty, LLC vs. Mireles, Richerly A. Fana Nina, Francisco A.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 1229-1273 Realty, LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Mireles, Richerly A Fana Nina, Francisco A. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Bronx County Civil Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Krzysztof Lach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/BX

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Krzysztof Lach

 

Party Details

Petitioner

1229-1273 Realty, LLC

Respondents

Richerly A. Mireles

Francisco A. Fana Nina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Todd Rothenberg

271 North Ave Ste 115

New Rochelle, NY 10801-5109

Respondent Attorney

NAICA

Attorney at NAICA

1075 Grand Concourse

Bronx, NY 10452

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Krzysztof Lach Part E; Motion Seq: 005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:45 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Malaika Scott-McLaughlin-Bland 2- Housing Motion Part; Motion Seq: 005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 005; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: For Permission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Krzysztof Lach Part E; Motion Seq: 004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Krzysztof Lach

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part E; Motion Seq: 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part E; Motion Seq: 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: OSC Denied - No Calendar Date Before Judge: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part E; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Norma J. Jennings Part E; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, Issuance Stayed per Stipulation/Order, Execution Stayed per Stipulation/Order, Earliest Execution Date 10/10/2019; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part E

    Read MoreRead Less