This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 02/03/2023 at 21:10:28 (UTC).

Rock Ridge at Viewpointe, LLC, Plaintiff(s) vs. Viewpointe Professional Office Center Association, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Rock Ridge at Viewpointe, LLC, Plaintiff s filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Viewpointe Professional Office Center Association, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Eighth District Court located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Denton, Mark R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********23-B

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Denton, Mark R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rock Ridge at Viewpointe, LLC

Rock Ridge at Viewpointe I, LLC

Rock Ridge at Viewpointe II, LLC

Rock Ridge at Viewpointe III, LLC

Rock Ridge at Viewpointe IV, LLC

Rock Ridge at Viewpointe V, LLC

Rock Ridge at Viewpointe VI, LLC

Defendants

K.G.D.O. Holding Company, Inc.

Viewpointe Professional Office Center Association

Johnson, Chipper

Viewpointe Professional Office Center, LLC

Viewpointe Professional Office Center IV, LLC

RESG Corporation

Terra West Management Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stein, Kimberly P.

Defendant Attorneys

Anderson, Sean L.

Gunnerson, Spencer

Jones, Jon Randall

Stark, Katrina Maree

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPS (CIV)

01/23/2023: Opposition - OPPS (CIV)

Opposition - OPPS (CIV)

01/17/2023: Opposition - OPPS (CIV)

Clerk's Notice of Hearing - CNOC (CIV)

01/09/2023: Clerk's Notice of Hearing - CNOC (CIV)

Motion to Disqualify Attorney - MDQA (CIV)

01/05/2023: Motion to Disqualify Attorney - MDQA (CIV)

Notice of Entry - NEO (CIV)

01/04/2023: Notice of Entry - NEO (CIV)

Stipulation and Order

01/04/2023: Stipulation and Order

Opposition and Countermotion - OPPC (CIV)

01/03/2023: Opposition and Countermotion - OPPC (CIV)

Clerk's Notice of Hearing - CNOC (CIV)

12/30/2022: Clerk's Notice of Hearing - CNOC (CIV)

Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

12/27/2022: Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

Joinder - JOIN (CIV)

12/27/2022: Joinder - JOIN (CIV)

Motion to Dismiss - MDSM (CIV)

12/27/2022: Motion to Dismiss - MDSM (CIV)

Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

12/27/2022: Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

Proof of Service - PSER (CIV)

12/08/2022: Proof of Service - PSER (CIV)

Proof of Service - PSER (CIV)

12/08/2022: Proof of Service - PSER (CIV)

Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document - CNND (CIV)

12/08/2022: Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document - CNND (CIV)

Acceptance of Service - ACSR (CIV)

12/06/2022: Acceptance of Service - ACSR (CIV)

First Amended Complaint - FAC (CIV)

12/01/2022: First Amended Complaint - FAC (CIV)

Acceptance of Service - ACSR (CIV)

11/30/2022: Acceptance of Service - ACSR (CIV)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketMotion to Disqualify Attorney; Judicial Officer: Denton, Mark R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Defendants' Viewpoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services Counsel of Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketOpposition and Countermotion; Judicial Officer: Denton, Mark R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Chipper Johnson, Viewpointe Professional Office Center, LLC, Viewpointe Professional Office Center IV, LLC, and RESG Corporation's Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified First Amended Complaint and Defendants Viewpoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services' Joinder Thereto; and Countermotion to Strike Defendants Viewpoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services' Joinder to Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketJoinder; Judicial Officer: Denton, Mark R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Defendants ViewPoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services' Joinder to Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Judicial Officer: Denton, Mark R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Defendants Chipper Johnson, Viewpointe Professional Office Center, LLC, Viewpointe Professional Office Center IV, LLC, and RESG Corporation's Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition; Comment: [32] Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Defendants' Viewpoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services Counsel of Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition; Comment: [31] Defendants Viewpoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services Opposition to Countermotion to Strike Joinder to Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs Verified First Amended Complaint and Reply In Support Of Joinder to Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Hearing; Comment: [30] Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Disqualify Attorney; Comment: [29] Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Defendants' Viewpoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services Counsel of Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry; Comment: [28] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Move Hearing Date for Defendants Chipper Johnson, Viewpointe Professional Office Center, LLC, Viewpointe Professional Office Center IV, LLC, and RESG Corporations Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs Verified First Amended Complaint and Defendants Viewpoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services Joinder Thereto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Comment: [27] Stipulation and Order to Move Hearing Date for Defendants Chipper Johnson, Viewpointe Professional Office Center, LLC, Viewpointe Professional Office Center IV, LLC, and Resg Corporation's Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified First Amended Complaint and Defendants Viewpoint Professional Office Center Association and Terra West Management Services' Joinder Thereto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rock Ridge at Viewpointe, LLC : Transaction Assessment; $1710.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Rock Ridge at Viewpointe, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $1,710.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $1,710.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [8] Summons - K.G.D.O. Holding Company, Inc. dba Terra West Management Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [7] Summons - RESG Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [6] Summons - Viewpointe Professional Office Center IV, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [5] Summons - Viewpointe Professional Office Center, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [4] Summons - Chipper Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [3] Summons - Viewpointe Professional Office Center Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Appearance Fee Disclosure; Comment: [2] Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Business Court); Comment: [1] Verified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less