This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 02/03/2023 at 04:02:09 (UTC).

Lourdes Yunuen Lopez Olivo, Plaintiff vs. Alberto Plata, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Lourdes Yunuen Lopez Olivo, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Alberto Plata, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Eighth District Court located in Clark, Nevada. The Judges overseeing this case are Harter, Mathew and Vacant, FC N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********57-D

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judges

Harter, Mathew

Vacant, FC N

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lopez Olivo, Lourdes Yunuen

Defendant

Plata, Alberto

Minor

Plata Olivo, Gabriela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

La Forgia, Madeline, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Divorce - COMD (FAM)

11/29/2022: Complaint for Divorce - COMD (FAM)

Statement of Legal Aid Representation and Fee Waiver - SOLA (FAM)

11/29/2022: Statement of Legal Aid Representation and Fee Waiver - SOLA (FAM)

Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction RPRI (FAM)

12/06/2022: Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction RPRI (FAM)

Affidavit of Service - AOS (FAM)

12/21/2022: Affidavit of Service - AOS (FAM)

Summons - SUMM (FAM)

12/21/2022: Summons - SUMM (FAM)

Joint Preliminary Injunction - JPI (FAM)

12/21/2022: Joint Preliminary Injunction - JPI (FAM)

Answer - Divorce, Annulment, Separate Maintenence - ADAS (FAM)

01/03/2023: Answer - Divorce, Annulment, Separate Maintenence - ADAS (FAM)

Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

01/03/2023: Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

NRCP 16.2 Case Management Conference Order

01/04/2023: NRCP 16.2 Case Management Conference Order

Order for Family Mediation Center Services

01/04/2023: Order for Family Mediation Center Services

Order

01/04/2023: Order

Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

01/19/2023: Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harter, Mathew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; Comment: [14] Certificate of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFinancial Disclosure Form; Comment: [13] General Financial Disclosure Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comment: [12] Order of Procedures

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Family Mediation Center Services; Comment: [11] Order for Family Mediation Center

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNRCP 16.2 Case Management Conference Order; Comment: [10] NRCP 16.2 Case Management Conference Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Plata, Alberto : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2023-00253-CCCLK; Plata, Alberto $217.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Plata, Alberto : Transaction Assessment; $217.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Plata, Alberto ; Total Financial Assessment $217.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $217.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; Comment: [9] Certificate of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons; Comment: [6] Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comment: [5] Affidavit/Declaration of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSummons; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [4] Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction; Comment: [3] Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopez Olivo, Lourdes Yunuen : Fee Waiver; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopez Olivo, Lourdes Yunuen : Transaction Assessment; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Lopez Olivo, Lourdes Yunuen ; Total Financial Assessment $299.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Legal Aid Representation and Fee Waiver; Comment: [2] Statement of Legal Aid Representation and Fee Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: [1] Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less