This case was last updated from Clark Nevada Court System on 12/08/2020 at 04:36:25 (UTC).

Lisa Shriver, Plaintiff vs. Steven Brooks, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Lisa Shriver, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Steven Brooks, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark Nevada Court System, Eighth District Court located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Henderson, Bill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********74-D

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Eighth District Court

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Henderson, Bill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shriver, Lisa

Defendant

Brooks, Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Varshney, Garima, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Waiver of Counsel - WOC (FAM)

11/30/2020: Waiver of Counsel - WOC (FAM)

Answer to Complaint - ANSC (FAM)

11/30/2020: Answer to Complaint - ANSC (FAM)

Complaint for Divorce - COMD (FAM)

09/11/2020: Complaint for Divorce - COMD (FAM)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Shriver, Lisa : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2020-67407-CCCLK; Shriver, Lisa $217.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Shriver, Lisa : Transaction Assessment; $217.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Counsel; Comment: Waiver of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSummons; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Shriver, Lisa : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2020-50871-CCCLK; Shriver, Lisa $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Shriver, Lisa : Transaction Assessment; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Shriver, Lisa ; Total Financial Assessment $516.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $516.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less