This case was last updated from Clark Nevada Court System on 06/22/2022 at 11:33:16 (UTC).

Jesus Moreno Baena, Plaintiff vs. Joaquin Elias Gadea Frances, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Jesus Moreno Baena, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Joaquin Elias Gadea Frances, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark Nevada Court System, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The Judges overseeing this case are Rocheleau, Stacy M. and Harter, Mathew. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********44-D

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judges

Rocheleau, Stacy M.

Harter, Mathew

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baena, Jesus Moreno

Defendant

Frances, Joaquin Elias Gadea

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Divorce

06/25/2020: Complaint for Divorce

Summons Issued Only

06/25/2020: Summons Issued Only

Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injuncti

06/25/2020: Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injuncti

Exhibits

06/25/2020: Exhibits

Order to Show Cause

10/23/2020: Order to Show Cause

Minutes - Order to Show Cause

11/02/2020: Minutes - Order to Show Cause

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAdministrative Reassignment to Department W; Comment: Case Reassignment - Judicial Officer Stacy M. Rocheleau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; View Document: Minutes - Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Harter, Mathew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Decision Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: [5] Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Baena, Jesus Moreno : Payment (Mail); Receipt # 2020-15519-FAM; Moreno Baena, Jesus $299.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Baena, Jesus Moreno : Transaction Assessment; $299.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Baena, Jesus Moreno ; Total Financial Assessment $299.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $299.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketSummons; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; Comment: [4]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction; Comment: [3] Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Only; Comment: [2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: [1] Complaint for Divorce (No Children)

    Read MoreRead Less