This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 01/31/2023 at 20:34:27 (UTC).

Jennifer Kathleen Gist, Plaintiff vs. James Ewing Gist, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Jennifer Kathleen Gist, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against James Ewing Gist, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Rocheleau, Stacy M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********36-D

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Rocheleau, Stacy M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gist, Jennifer Kathleen

Defendant

Gist, James Ewing

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Divorce

03/01/2022: Complaint for Divorce

Summons Issued Only

03/01/2022: Summons Issued Only

Affidavit of Service

03/14/2022: Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Resident Witness

03/25/2022: Affidavit of Resident Witness

Affidavit in Support of Summary Disposition

03/25/2022: Affidavit in Support of Summary Disposition

Default

03/25/2022: Default

Request for Summary Disposition of Uncontested Div

03/25/2022: Request for Summary Disposition of Uncontested Div

Decree of Divorce

03/25/2022: Decree of Divorce

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree of Divorce; Comment: [11] Decree of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Summary Disposition of Uncontested Div/Ann; Comment: [10] Request for Summary Disposition of Uncontested Div/Ann

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault; Comment: [9] Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit in Support of Summary Disposition; Comment: [8] Affidavit in Support of Summary Disposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Resident Witness; Comment: [7] Affidavit of Resident Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketConfidential Information sheet - Domestics; Comment: [6] Confidential Information sheet - Domestics

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comment: [5] Affidavit of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSummons; Served: 03/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Comment: [4] Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketApplication to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Comment: [3] Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Only; Comment: [2] Summons Issued Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: [1] Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less