This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 02/01/2023 at 05:04:27 (UTC).

James Frasure, Plaintiff vs. Brittany Quintana, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 James Frasure, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Brittany Quintana, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Almase, Heidi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********84-D

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Almase, Heidi

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Frasure, James

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Quintana, Brittany

Minor

Frasure, Magdalena

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Divorce - COMD (FAM)

04/15/2022: Complaint for Divorce - COMD (FAM)

Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction RPRI (FAM)

04/15/2022: Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction RPRI (FAM)

Joint Preliminary Injunction - JPI (FAM)

04/18/2022: Joint Preliminary Injunction - JPI (FAM)

Affidavit of Service - AOS (FAM)

04/22/2022: Affidavit of Service - AOS (FAM)

Answer - ANS (FAM)

04/27/2022: Answer - ANS (FAM)

Order for Family Mediation Center Services

05/03/2022: Order for Family Mediation Center Services

NRCP 16.2 Case Management Conference Order

05/03/2022: NRCP 16.2 Case Management Conference Order

Reply to Counterclaim - RCCM (FAM)

05/10/2022: Reply to Counterclaim - RCCM (FAM)

Stipulation and Order

06/20/2022: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Entry - NEO (FAM)

06/21/2022: Notice of Entry - NEO (FAM)

Request for Summary Disposition - RSD (FAM)

07/01/2022: Request for Summary Disposition - RSD (FAM)

Affidavit in Support of Summary Disposition - AFSD (FAM)

07/01/2022: Affidavit in Support of Summary Disposition - AFSD (FAM)

Affidavit of Resident Witness - AFFR (FAM)

07/05/2022: Affidavit of Resident Witness - AFFR (FAM)

Decree of Divorce

07/06/2022: Decree of Divorce

Notice of Withdrawal - NOW (FAM)

07/06/2022: Notice of Withdrawal - NOW (FAM)

Notice of Entry of Decree - NED (FAM)

07/06/2022: Notice of Entry of Decree - NED (FAM)

Withdrawal of Attorney - WOA (FAM)

07/07/2022: Withdrawal of Attorney - WOA (FAM)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketReturn Hearing; Judicial Officer: Almase, Heidi; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: FMC Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Almase, Heidi; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWithdrawal of Attorney; Comment: [19] Withdrawal of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Decree; Comment: [18] Notice of Entry of Stipulated Decree of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal; Comment: [17] Notice of Withdrawl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree of Divorce; Comment: [16] Decree of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Resident Witness; Comment: [15] Affidavit of Resident Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit in Support of Summary Disposition; Comment: [14] Affidavit in support of Summary Disposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Summary Disposition; Comment: [13] Request for Summary Disposition of Decree of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry; Comment: [12] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comment: [6] Declaration of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFinancial Disclosure Form; Comment: [5] Financial Disclosure Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Preliminary Injunction; Comment: [4] Joint Preliminary Injunction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Frasure, James : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2022-22813-CCCLK; Frasure, James $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Frasure, James : Transaction Assessment; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Frasure, James ; Total Financial Assessment $299.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSummons; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [3] Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction; Comment: [2] Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: [1] Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less