This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/29/2022 at 20:40:06 (UTC).

Edwin O Andrade-Hinojosa, Plaintiff. vs. Mirna M Rivera-Montezuma, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Edwin O Andrade-Hinojosa, Plaintiff filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against Mirna M Rivera-Montezuma, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Throne, Dawn R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********85-C

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Throne, Dawn R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Andrade-Hinojosa, Edwin O

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Rivera-Montezuma, Mirna M

Minor

Andrade-Rivera, Edwin I

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Custody - COMC (FAM)

03/09/2022: Complaint for Custody - COMC (FAM)

Affidavit of Service - AOS (FAM)

03/17/2022: Affidavit of Service - AOS (FAM)

Answer and Counterclaim - Child Custody - ACCC (FAM)

04/04/2022: Answer and Counterclaim - Child Custody - ACCC (FAM)

Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

04/04/2022: Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

NRCP 16.2 Case Management Conference Order

04/04/2022: NRCP 16.2 Case Management Conference Order

Order for Family Mediation Center Services

04/04/2022: Order for Family Mediation Center Services

Notice of Seminar Completion EDCR 5.07 - NOPC (FAM)

04/13/2022: Notice of Seminar Completion EDCR 5.07 - NOPC (FAM)

Minutes - All Pending Motions

05/10/2022: Minutes - All Pending Motions

Order Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial

05/11/2022: Order Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial

Order

05/31/2022: Order

Notice of Entry of Order - NEOJ (FAM)

05/31/2022: Notice of Entry of Order - NEOJ (FAM)

Custody Decree / Order

09/01/2022: Custody Decree / Order

Notice of Entry of Decree - NED (FAM)

09/07/2022: Notice of Entry of Decree - NED (FAM)

Withdrawal of Attorney - WOA (FAM)

09/07/2022: Withdrawal of Attorney - WOA (FAM)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketEvidentiary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Throne, Dawn R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (stack #1 ~ half day)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCalendar Call; Judicial Officer: Throne, Dawn R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWithdrawal of Attorney; Comment: [16] Withdrawal of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Decree; Comment: [15] Notice of Entry of Stipulated Custody Decree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCustody Decree / Order; Comment: [14] Stipulated Custody Decree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketFinancial Disclosure Form; Comment: [13] General Financial Disclosure Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order; Comment: [12] Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comment: [11] Order After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial; Comment: [10] Case and Evidentiary Hearing/Non-Jury Trial Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAll Pending Motions; View Document: Minutes - All Pending Motions; Judicial Officer: Throne, Dawn R.; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Parties Present: Plaintiff: Andrade-Hinojosa, Edwin O; Defendant: Rivera-Montezuma, Mirna M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; Comment: [5] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Counterclaim - Child Custody; Comment: [4] Answer And Counterclaim For Custody And UCCJEA Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comment: [3] Affidavit of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Andrade-Hinojosa, Edwin O : Transaction Assessment; $259.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSummons; Served: 03/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Andrade-Hinojosa, Edwin O : Payment (Window); Receipt # 2022-03714-FAM; Emily Stevens $259.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Andrade-Hinojosa, Edwin O : Transaction Assessment; $259.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Andrade-Hinojosa, Edwin O ; Total Financial Assessment $518.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $259.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [2] Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Custody; Comment: [1] Complaint for Custody

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less