This case was last updated from Clark Nevada Court System on 07/16/2021 at 20:32:27 (UTC).

Deuntae Brown, Plaintiff(s) vs. T.A. Poole, LLC, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Deuntae Brown, Plaintiff s filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against T A Poole, LLC, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark Nevada Court System, Eighth District Court located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Krall, Nadia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********05-C

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Krall, Nadia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brown, Deuntae

Washington-Brown, Kamiko

Dejon, Brown

Defendants

T.A. Poole, LLC

Poole-Sanford, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Albright, George Mark

Alvarez, Jorge L.

Ormsby, Daniel R.

Smith, Hayden Robert Draper

Aicklen, Josh C.

Avakian, David B.

Blumberg, Carlos

Herling, Candace C.

Mortensen, David J.

 

Court Documents

Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident - USCN (CIV)

07/15/2021: Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident - USCN (CIV)

Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident - USCN (CIV)

07/15/2021: Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident - USCN (CIV)

Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident - USCN (CIV)

07/15/2021: Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident - USCN (CIV)

Demand for Security of Costs - DMSC (CIV)

07/12/2021: Demand for Security of Costs - DMSC (CIV)

Demand for Jury Trial - DMJT (CIV)

07/12/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - DMJT (CIV)

Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

07/12/2021: Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

Answer - ANS (CIV)

07/12/2021: Answer - ANS (CIV)

Disclosure Statement - DSST (CIV)

07/12/2021: Disclosure Statement - DSST (CIV)

Consent to Service By Electronic Means - CSRE (CIV)

07/12/2021: Consent to Service By Electronic Means - CSRE (CIV)

Demand for Jury Trial - DMJT (CIV)

07/12/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - DMJT (CIV)

Demand for Security of Costs - DMSC (CIV)

07/12/2021: Demand for Security of Costs - DMSC (CIV)

Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

07/12/2021: Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

Answer - ANS (CIV)

07/12/2021: Answer - ANS (CIV)

Affidavit of Service - AOS (CIV)

07/06/2021: Affidavit of Service - AOS (CIV)

Affidavit of Service - AOS (CIV)

07/06/2021: Affidavit of Service - AOS (CIV)

Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

06/18/2021: Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure - IAFD (CIV)

Complaint - COMP (CIV)

06/18/2021: Complaint - COMP (CIV)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUndertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident; Comment: Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident Plaintiff Dejon Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUndertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident; Comment: Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident Plaintiff Kamiko Washington-Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUndertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident; Comment: Undertaking for Security for Costs for Non-Resident Plaintiff Deuntae Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Poole-Sanford, LLC : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2021-43032-CCCLK; Poole-Sanford, LLC $446.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Poole-Sanford, LLC : Transaction Assessment; $446.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Poole-Sanford, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $446.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $446.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for T.A. Poole, LLC : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2021-43005-CCCLK; T.A. Poole, LLC $223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for T.A. Poole, LLC : Transaction Assessment; $223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: T.A. Poole, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $223.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Security of Costs; Comment: Demand for Security of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comment: Defendant T.A. Poole, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comment: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comment: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Brown, Deuntae : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2021-38422-CCCLK; Brown, Deuntae $330.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Brown, Deuntae : Transaction Assessment; $330.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Brown, Deuntae ; Total Financial Assessment $330.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $330.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Appearance Fee Disclosure; Comment: Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less