This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 02/04/2023 at 00:19:26 (UTC).

Chari Renae Taylor, Plaintiff vs. Timothy Lynn Taylor, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Chari Renae Taylor, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Timothy Lynn Taylor, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Almase, Heidi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********68-D

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Almase, Heidi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Taylor, Chari Renae

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Taylor, Timothy Lynn

Minor

Taylor, Tristan Katriel

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry - NEO (FAM)

12/05/2022: Notice of Entry - NEO (FAM)

Order

12/01/2022: Order

Order

12/01/2022: Order

Order

11/23/2022: Order

Withdrawal of Attorney - WOA (FAM)

11/04/2022: Withdrawal of Attorney - WOA (FAM)

Notice of Entry of Order - NEOJ (FAM)

11/02/2022: Notice of Entry of Order - NEOJ (FAM)

Order to Withdraw as Attorney of Record

11/02/2022: Order to Withdraw as Attorney of Record

Objection - OBJ (FAM)

09/07/2022: Objection - OBJ (FAM)

Objection - OBJ (FAM)

09/06/2022: Objection - OBJ (FAM)

Order Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial

09/01/2022: Order Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial

Memorandum - MEMO (FAM)

08/30/2022: Memorandum - MEMO (FAM)

Notice of Entry - NEO (FAM)

08/29/2022: Notice of Entry - NEO (FAM)

Order

08/28/2022: Order

Reply to Opposition - ROPP (FAM)

08/27/2022: Reply to Opposition - ROPP (FAM)

Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

08/14/2022: Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

08/14/2022: Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

Return Hearing

08/11/2022: Return Hearing

Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

08/08/2022: Certificate of Service - CSERV (FAM)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Almase, Heidi; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FULL DAY - FIRM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCalendar Call; Judicial Officer: Almase, Heidi; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated - per Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry; Comment: [45] Notice of Entry of Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comment: [44] Order to Vacate Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comment: [43] Order to Vacate Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comment: [42] Order Granting Plaintiff Award for Attorney Fees and Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWithdrawal of Attorney; Comment: [41] NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF UNBUNDLED ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order; Comment: [40] Notice of Entry of Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw as Attorney of Record; Comment: [39] Consent Order for Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDecision; Judicial Officer: Almase, Heidi; Hearing Time: 3:00 AM; Comment: re: Attorney's Fees and Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Taylor, Chari Renae : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2022-16546-CCCLK; Taylor, Chari Renae $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Taylor, Chari Renae : Transaction Assessment; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Taylor, Chari Renae ; Total Financial Assessment $299.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketSummons; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons; Comment: [6] Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Preliminary Injunction; Comment: [4] Joint Preliminary Injunction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [5] Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Plaintiff; Comment: [3] Declaration of Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction; Comment: [2] Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: [1] Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less