This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 01/31/2023 at 18:52:46 (UTC).

Brenda Martin Barrera, Plaintiff vs. Andy Saenz, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 Brenda Martin Barrera, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Andy Saenz, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The Judges overseeing this case are Almase, Heidi and Rocheleau, Stacy M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********74-D

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judges

Almase, Heidi

Rocheleau, Stacy M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin Barrera, Brenda

Defendant

Saenz, Andy

Minors

Saenz, Aiden Jay

Saenz, Isayah Rey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marks, Daniel

Young, Nicole M., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Withdrawal - NOW (FAM)

12/12/2022: Notice of Withdrawal - NOW (FAM)

Notice of Entry of Decree - NED (FAM)

12/12/2022: Notice of Entry of Decree - NED (FAM)

Decree of Divorce

12/12/2022: Decree of Divorce

Affidavit of Resident Witness - AFFR (FAM)

12/12/2022: Affidavit of Resident Witness - AFFR (FAM)

Affidavit in Support of Summary Disposition - AFSD (FAM)

12/12/2022: Affidavit in Support of Summary Disposition - AFSD (FAM)

Request for Summary Disposition - RSD (FAM)

12/07/2022: Request for Summary Disposition - RSD (FAM)

Settlement Conference

11/17/2022: Settlement Conference

Notice - NOTC (FAM)

11/15/2022: Notice - NOTC (FAM)

Notice of Hearing - NOH (FAM)

10/05/2022: Notice of Hearing - NOH (FAM)

Notice of Entry of Order - NEOJ (FAM)

08/08/2022: Notice of Entry of Order - NEOJ (FAM)

Order

08/05/2022: Order

Return Hearing

08/02/2022: Return Hearing

Notice - NOTC (FAM)

07/26/2022: Notice - NOTC (FAM)

Exhibits - EXHS (FAM)

07/25/2022: Exhibits - EXHS (FAM)

Order

06/16/2022: Order

Order

05/31/2022: Order

Minutes - All Pending Motions

05/31/2022: Minutes - All Pending Motions

Exhibits - EXHS (FAM)

05/29/2022: Exhibits - EXHS (FAM)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketStatus Check; Judicial Officer: Rocheleau, Stacy M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated - per Order; Comment: Settlement Conference Outcome; Do not vacate without speaking to JEA first

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal; Comment: [39] Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Decree; Comment: [38] Notice Of Entry Of Stipulated Decree Of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree of Divorce; Comment: [37] Stipulated Decree of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Resident Witness; Comment: [36] Declaration Of Resident Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit in Support of Summary Disposition; Comment: [35] Declaration In Support Of Request Of Summary Disposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Summary Disposition; Comment: [34] Request For Summary Disposition Of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Conference; Comment: Judicial Settlement Conference; Parties Present: Plaintiff: Martin Barrera, Brenda; Attorney: Young, Nicole M., ESQ: Defendant: Saenz, Andy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSettlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Rocheleau, Stacy M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comment: [33] Notice of Audio/Visual Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Counterclaim; Comment: [6] Answer and Counterclaim to Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Comment: [5] Notice of Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons; Comment: [4] Summons - Andy Saenz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Martin Barrera, Brenda : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2022-10719-CCCLK; Martin Barrera, Brenda $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Martin Barrera, Brenda : Transaction Assessment; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Martin Barrera, Brenda ; Total Financial Assessment $299.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketSummons; Served: 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [3] Summons - Andy Saenz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Appearance Fee Disclosure; Comment: [2] Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: [1] Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less