This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 02/05/2023 at 11:38:30 (UTC).

Aundoy Terrain Jackson, Plaintiff vs. Sonja Jackson, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Aundoy Terrain Jackson, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Sonja Jackson, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Rocheleau, Stacy M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********08-D

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Rocheleau, Stacy M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackson, Aundoy Terrain

Defendant

Jackson, Sonja

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elliot, Ian Albert

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Divorce - COMD (FAM)

11/29/2022: Complaint for Divorce - COMD (FAM)

Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction RPRI (FAM)

11/29/2022: Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction RPRI (FAM)

Joint Preliminary Injunction - JPI (FAM)

12/01/2022: Joint Preliminary Injunction - JPI (FAM)

Affidavit of Resident Witness - AFFR (FAM)

12/09/2022: Affidavit of Resident Witness - AFFR (FAM)

Certificate of Mailing - CERT (FAM)

01/11/2023: Certificate of Mailing - CERT (FAM)

Affidavit of Attempted Service - AFAS (FAM)

01/18/2023: Affidavit of Attempted Service - AFAS (FAM)

Affidavit of Due Diligence - AFDD (FAM)

01/18/2023: Affidavit of Due Diligence - AFDD (FAM)

Ex Parte Motion - EXMT (FAM)

01/19/2023: Ex Parte Motion - EXMT (FAM)

Order for Service by Publication

01/20/2023: Order for Service by Publication

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Service by Publication; Comment: [10] Order for Service by Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Motion; Comment: [9] Ex Parte Motion for Service by Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Due Diligence; Comment: [8] Plaintiff's Attempted of Due Diligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Attempted Service; Comment: [7] Plaintiff's Affidavit of Non Service / Attempted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Comment: [6] Certificate of Mailing for Complaint, SEI and JPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Resident Witness; Comment: [5] Affidavit of Resident Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jackson, Aundoy Terrain : Efile Payment; Receipt # 2022-69449-CCCLK; Jackson, Aundoy Terrain $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jackson, Aundoy Terrain : Transaction Assessment; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Jackson, Aundoy Terrain ; Total Financial Assessment $299.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketSummons; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Preliminary Injunction; Comment: [4] JPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [3] SEI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction; Comment: [2] Request for Issuance of Joint Preliminary Injunction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: [1] Complaint For Divorce And UCCJEA Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less