This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 02/01/2023 at 00:28:14 (UTC).

Andrew Lawrence Segal, Plaintiff vs. Angellina Mary Segal, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 Andrew Lawrence Segal, Plaintiff filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Angellina Mary Segal, Defendant. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The Judge overseeing this case is Rocheleau, Stacy M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********04-D

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

Judge Details

Judge

Rocheleau, Stacy M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Segal, Andrew Lawrence

Defendant

Segal, Angellina Mary

Minors

Segal, Gabrielle Olivia

Segal, Ethan Jacob

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Divorce

03/22/2022: Complaint for Divorce

Notice

04/05/2022: Notice

Waiver of Service of Summons and Complaint

04/05/2022: Waiver of Service of Summons and Complaint

Default

05/23/2022: Default

Affidavit of Resident Witness

05/25/2022: Affidavit of Resident Witness

Request for Summary Disposition

05/25/2022: Request for Summary Disposition

Afft Support of Req for Summary Dispo for Decree o

05/25/2022: Afft Support of Req for Summary Dispo for Decree o

Request for Waiver of Program Attendance / Order

05/26/2022: Request for Waiver of Program Attendance / Order

Decree of Divorce

05/31/2022: Decree of Divorce

Notice of Entry of Decree

06/03/2022: Notice of Entry of Decree

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Decree; Comment: [12]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Segal, Andrew Lawrence : Payment (Window); Receipt # 2022-09198-FAM; Segal, Andrew Lawrence $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Segal, Andrew Lawrence : Transaction Assessment; $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree of Divorce; Comment: [11] Decree of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Program Attendance / Order; Comment: [10] Request and Order for Waiver of Program Attendance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketChild Support and Welfare Party Identification Sheet; Comment: [9] Child Support and Welfare Party Identification Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAfft Support of Req for Summary Dispo for Decree of Divorce; Comment: [8] Afft in Support of Reqt for Summary Dispo for Decree of Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Summary Disposition; Comment: [7] Request for Summary Disposition of Decree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Resident Witness; Comment: [6] Affidavit of Resident Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault; Comment: [5] Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Service of Summons and Complaint; Comment: [4] Waiver of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comment: [3] Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Segal, Andrew Lawrence : Payment (Window); Receipt # 2022-04608-FAM; Segal, Andrew Lawrence $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Segal, Andrew Lawrence : Transaction Assessment; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Segal, Andrew Lawrence ; Total Financial Assessment $309.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $309.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSummons; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSummons Electronically Issued - Service Pending; Comment: [2]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Divorce; Comment: [1] Complaint for Divorce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less