This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 11:04:17 (UTC).

PLUS CREDIT UNION, Plaintiff vs. JUAN P ENRIQUEZ, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 PLUS CREDIT UNION, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN P ENRIQUEZ, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0117

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLUS CREDIT UNION

Defendant

ENRIQUEZ, JUAN P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: Projected Return - 90 days: Plaintiff's Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DispositionDisposition - Default Judgment: (Judicial Officer: Tindall, Randall); Debtors: JUAN P ENRIQUEZ (Defendant), Creditors: PLUS CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff), Judgment: 09/08/2020, Docketed: 09/08/2020, Total Judgment: 6,215.79

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Business: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Tindall, Randall); Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDocuments in Support: Supporting Documentation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Business: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Regarding Small Claims Motion/Request for Continuance - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Continuance: SMALL CLAIMS MOTION/REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Business: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Zarcone, Justin); Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Regarding Small Claims Motion/Request for Continuance - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs and Disbursements: memorandum of cost disbursements

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED JUAN P ENRIQUEZ ON 1/21/2020 BY LAS VEGAS CONSTABLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-02911; PLUS CREDIT UNION; (146.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 146.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Plaintiff: PLUS CREDIT UNION; Total Financial Assessment: 146.00; Total Payments and Credits: 146.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: ENRIQUEZ, JUAN P Served 01/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $5,000.01 to $7,500: SMALL CLAIMS COMPLAINT $5,929.46

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less