This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 10:59:07 (UTC).

Juan Martinez Inc, DBA Century 21 Americana, Plaintiff vs. Puiu Cornel, Puiu Angela Luminata, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Juan Martinez Inc, DBA Century 21 Americana, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Puiu Cornel, Puiu Angela Luminata, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0090

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Martinez Inc DBA Century 21 Americana

Defendants

Luminata, Puiu Angela

Cornel, Puiu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert R. McCoy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (); Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Business: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ferreira, Amy); Vacated; 10/07/2020 Reset by Court to 10/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Regarding Small Claims Motion/Request for Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence: Mtn for Service of Small Claim: small claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance: Notice of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMotion: Motion for Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Business: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Continue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Continuing Trial/Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: Luminata, Puiu Angela Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: Cornel, Puiu Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-02271; Juan Martinez Inc; (106.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 106.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Plaintiff: Juan Martinez Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 106.00; Total Payments and Credits: 106.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $2,500.01 to $5,000: Small Claims Complaint $2,637.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less