This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 10:55:46 (UTC).

Jienna A Looney, Plaintiff(s) vs. J Jesus N Hernandez Mendoza, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Jienna A Looney, Plaintiff s filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J Jesus N Hernandez Mendoza, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0087

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Looney, Jienna A

Defendant

Hernandez Mendoza, J Jesus N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamie S. Cogburn

Defendant Attorney

Joseph J. Purdy, ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketExhibit Retention Period Expired

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment: Satisfaction of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DispositionDisposition - Order for Judgment: (Judicial Officer: Westmeyer, Daniel); Debtors: J Jesus N Hernandez Mendoza (Defendant), Creditors: Jienna A Looney (Plaintiff), Judgment: 07/14/2020, Docketed: 07/14/2020, Total Judgment: 1,969.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment: Small Claims Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: Projected Return - 90 days: Plaintiff & Defendant exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCase Taken Under Advisement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Result: Under Advisement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketBrief: Small Claims Trial Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated; 03/25/2020 Reset by Court to 04/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Continuing Trial/Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Answer: Small Claims Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service: Affidavit of Service for J Jesus Hernandez Mendoza

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: Hernandez Mendoza, J Jesus N Served 01/08/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-02057; Looney, Jienna A; (196.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 196.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Plaintiff: Looney, Jienna A; Total Financial Assessment: 196.00; Total Payments and Credits: 196.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $7,500.01 to $10,000: Small Claims Complaint $10,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less