This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 10:51:06 (UTC).

Filomena Fravel, Plaintiff(s) vs. Speed Shop LLC, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/05/2020 Filomena Fravel, Plaintiff s filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Speed Shop LLC, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0072

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fravel, Filomena

Defendant

Speed Shop LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • DispositionDisposition - Order for Judgment: (Judicial Officer: Westmeyer, Daniel); Debtors: Speed Shop LLC (Defendant), Creditors: Filomena Fravel (Plaintiff), Judgment: 07/15/2020, Docketed: 07/15/2020, Total Judgment: 3,424.46

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketJudgment: Small Claims Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: Projected Return - 90 days: Plaintiff exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase Taken Under Advisement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address: form filled out in open court by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Result: Under Advisement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (); Vacated; 03/24/2020 Reset by Court to 04/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketReturned Correspondence: Returned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Notice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Continuing Trial/Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Notice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Proof of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-01479; Speed Shop LLC; (106.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 106.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Defendant: Speed Shop LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 106.00; Total Payments and Credits: 106.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: Speed Shop LLC Served 01/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $2,500.01 to $5,000: Small Claims Complaint $3,318.46

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less