This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 10:55:58 (UTC).

Cristina Mandera, Plaintiff(s) vs. Shelby A Bashaw, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Cristina Mandera, Plaintiff s filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Shelby A Bashaw, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0084

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mandera, Cristina

Defendant

Bashaw, Shelby A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J. Ream

Defendant Attorney

Scott Rogers

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry: Notice Of Entry Of Satisfaction Of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment: Satisfaction of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketReturned Correspondence: Returned Correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: Projected Return - 90 days: Defendant exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DispositionDisposition - Order for Judgment: (Judicial Officer: Ferreira, Amy); Debtors: Shelby A Bashaw (Defendant), Creditors: Cristina Mandera (Plaintiff), Judgment: 07/13/2020, Docketed: 07/13/2020, Total Judgment: 3,569.85

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketJudgment: Small Claims Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-48209; Mandera, Cristina; (2.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCase Taken Under Advisement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketList of Witnesses: Defendant Shelby A. Bashaw's List of Witnesses and Documents for Small Claims Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketAffidavit: Affidavit of Compliance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: Bashaw, Shelby A Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-02048; Mandera, Cristina; (198.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 198.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Plaintiff: Mandera, Cristina; Total Financial Assessment: 203.50; Total Payments and Credits: 203.50; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $7,500.01 to $10,000: Small Claims Complaint $10,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less