This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 10:42:46 (UTC).

CASH 1 LLC, Plaintiff(s) vs. TRECIA PALOMAR, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 CASH 1 LLC, Plaintiff s filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRECIA PALOMAR, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASH 1 LLC

Defendant

PALOMAR, TRECIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims NRS Complaints: (1:00 PM) ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims NRS Complaints: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Regarding Small Claims Motion/Request for Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Continuance: SMALL CLAIMS MOTION/REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims NRS Complaints: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Regarding Small Claims Motion/Request for Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Continuance: SMALL CLAIMS MOTION/REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims NRS Complaints: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated; 04/01/2020 Reset by Court to 05/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Continuing Trial/Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Continuing Trial/Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: PALOMAR, TRECIA Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-00718; CASH 1 LLC; (66.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 66.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Plaintiff: CASH 1 LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 66.00; Total Payments and Credits: 66.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $1000 or less: Small Claims Complaint $547.55 NRS604(A) Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less