This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 10:59:21 (UTC).

Brianna Lozano, Plaintiff(s) vs. Taylor Anstaett, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Brianna Lozano, Plaintiff s filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Taylor Anstaett, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0108

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lozano, Brianna

Defendant

Anstaett, Taylor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Tindall, Randall); Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Regarding Small Claims Motion/Request for Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-44454; Anstaett, Taylor; (71.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 71.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Defendant: Anstaett, Taylor; Total Financial Assessment: 71.00; Total Payments and Credits: 71.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMotion: Motion For Cont

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketReturned Correspondence: Returned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (); Vacated; 03/26/2020 Reset by Court to 04/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFee Waiver: (86.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 86.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Plaintiff: Lozano, Brianna; Total Financial Assessment: 86.00; Total Payments and Credits: 86.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: Anstaett, Taylor Served 01/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $1000.01 to $2,500.00: Small Claims Complaint $1,054.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketApplication to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - Fee Waiver Req: Fee Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less