This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 10:56:03 (UTC).

AMRIT BHANDARI, Plaintiff(s) vs. Chris Schlidt, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 AMRIT BHANDARI, Plaintiff s filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Chris Schlidt, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0085

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BHANDARI, AMRIT

Defendant

Schlidt, Chris

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-49454; BHANDARI, AMRIT; (25.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketIssuance of Writ - Filing Fee: WRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DispositionDisposition - Default Judgment: (Judicial Officer: Westmeyer, Daniel); Debtors: Chris Schlidt (Defendant), Creditors: AMRIT BHANDARI (Plaintiff), Judgment: 07/07/2020, Docketed: 07/08/2020, Total Judgment: 1,945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketReturned Correspondence: Returned Correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated; 03/25/2020 Reset by Court to 04/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketOrder: Order Continuing Trial/Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Notice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Notice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: proof of srvice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: Schlidt, Chris Served 01/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-02053; BHANDARI, AMRIT; (86.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 86.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Plaintiff: BHANDARI, AMRIT; Total Financial Assessment: 111.00; Total Payments and Credits: 111.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $1000.01 to $2,500.00: Small Claims Complaint $1,859.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less