This case was last updated from Clark County Nevada Court on 11/18/2020 at 10:55:16 (UTC).

Alejandro Arnau, Yailen Hernandez, Lazaro Arce, Olidia Camargo, Plaintiff(s) vs. Jesus Iturralde, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Alejandro Arnau, Yailen Hernandez, Lazaro Arce, Olidia Camargo, Plaintiff s filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jesus Iturralde, Defendant s. This case was filed in Clark County Nevada Court, Regional Justice Center located in Clark, Nevada. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0083

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Clark, Nevada

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Camargo, Olidia

Hernandez, Yailen

Arnau, Alejandro

Arce, Lazaro

Defendant

Iturralde, Jesus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketExhibits Returned to: Exhibits returned to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketReturned Correspondence: Returned Correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketReturned Correspondence: Returned Correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: Projected Return - 90 days: Plaintiff & Defendant exhibts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DispositionDisposition - Order for Judgment: (Judicial Officer: Westmeyer, Daniel); Debtors: Jesus Iturralde (Defendant), Creditors: Alejandro Arnau (Plaintiff), Yailen Hernandez (Plaintiff), Lazaro Arce (Plaintiff), Olidia Camargo (Plaintiff), Judgment: 07/14/2020, Docketed: 07/14/2020, Total Judgment: 1,286.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment: Small Claims Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCase Taken Under Advisement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address: form filed in open court by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Result: Under Advisement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; Small Claims Individual: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Westmeyer, Daniel); Vacated; 03/25/2020 Reset by Court to 04/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Notice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint: Iturralde, Jesus Served 01/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFile and Serve Payments: Receipt # CIV-2020-02031; Arnau, Alejandro; (86.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 86.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information - Plaintiff: Arnau, Alejandro; Total Financial Assessment: 86.00; Total Payments and Credits: 86.00; Balance Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Affidavit of Complaint - $1000.01 to $2,500.00: Small Claims Affidavit of Complaint $1,200.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 5 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketStart Time Tracking: JCRCP 41(e) - 2 years

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less