This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 12/07/2022 at 17:11:47 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC VS SLOAN, TRACI

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SLOAN, TRACI. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL CONLON, WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Defendant

SLOAN, TRACI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2533.56

11/10/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2533.56

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/10/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 11/19 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

11/28/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 11/19 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

COURT NOTES

11/30/2022:COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF MEDIATION REPORT PARTIES CONTINUED TO 12/21/2022 mailed to defendant by clerk

11/30/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION REPORT PARTIES CONTINUED TO 12/21/2022 mailed to defendant by clerk

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/21/2022 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE TELEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 12/21/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/30/2022 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE TELEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION REPORT PARTIES CONTINUED TO 12/21/2022 mailed to defendant by clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 11/19 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 11/30/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $2533.56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2022008253

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAttorney: for to UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase 652022SC000252SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.