This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 01/07/2021 at 17:01:28 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS WATSON, ELISA

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WATSON, ELISA. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL CONLON, WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

WATSON, ELISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/08/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/27/2021 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 12/28/20 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/27/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2007406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAttorney: for to SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INCO WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $4017.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase 652020SC000265SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J