This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 23:32:06 (UTC).

STRONG, SARAH DENISE VS KENERSON, ANDRE RUSSELL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STRONG, SARAH DENISE filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against KENERSON, ANDRE RUSSELL. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FLURY, RONALD WALLACE, FLURY, RONALD W and JILL WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FLURY, RONALD WALLACE

FLURY, RONALD W

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STRONG, SARAH DENISE

Respondent

KENERSON, ANDRE RUSSELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RICHARDSON, TRUDY ELIZABETH INNES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketVITAL STATISTICS & FLDE FORMS (CAN ONLY SEND DK'S VS FORM. JK BORN IN GA.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON NAME CHANGE FOR MINOR CHILD VIA ZOOM SET FOR 3/26/21 AT 9:45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 3/26/2021 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPetitioner Attorney: Trudy Elizabeth Innes Richardson for to SARAH DENISE STRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketFDLE BACKGROUND CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: FLURY , RONALD W Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 1489

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 652021DR000067DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less