This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 07/22/2022 at 12:53:34 (UTC).

STOW AWAY MARINE & MORE INC, VS B & T MARINE FOR BRET STEPHENS

Case Summary

On 07/18/2014 STOW AWAY MARINE MORE INC, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against B T MARINE FOR BRET STEPHENS. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL CONLON, WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STOW AWAY MARINE & MORE INC,

Defendant

B & T MARINE FOR BRET STEPHENS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2014
  • Docketpl's copy of final judgment not mailed; no addressed stamped envelope provided and owes $7 for document preparation by clerk (F.J.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED AND CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketFILE SENT TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/24/2014 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketCOURT NOTES FROM 9/24/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TIMOTHY AVITABLE (SUBSTITUTE SERVICE) 7/23/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION FOR TIM AVITABLE FOR 9/24/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION FOR BRETT STEPHENS FOR 9/24/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF OWNERSHIP OF BUSINESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketPayment received: $100.00 Receipt Number CV 13006781

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketCase 652014SC000084SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less