This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 12/10/2020 at 23:33:16 (UTC).

ROJAS, COLLEEN ELIZABETH VS BROWN, KASEY E

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 ROJAS, COLLEEN ELIZABETH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BROWN, KASEY E. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FLURY, RONALD WALLACE, RONALD FLURY and FLURY, RONALD W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FLURY, RONALD WALLACE

RONALD FLURY

FLURY, RONALD W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROJAS, COLLEEN ELIZABETH

Respondent

BROWN, KASEY E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 12/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION WCSO & LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNO CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION LCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEvent DOMESTIC VIOL HRG scheduled on 12/8/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge RONALD FLURY presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION WCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketEvent DOMESTIC VIOL HRG scheduled on 11/24/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge RONALD FLURY presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION ON PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION ON RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase 652020DR000309DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketJudge: FLURY , RONALD W assigned

    Read MoreRead Less