This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 01/06/2021 at 12:01:38 (UTC).

ROJAS, COLLEEN ELIZABETH Et Al VS BROWN, KASEY E

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 ROJAS, COLLEEN ELIZABETH filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BROWN, KASEY E. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL CONLON and WALKER, JILL C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROJAS, JOHN DONOVAN

ROJAS, COLLEEN ELIZABETH

Defendant

BROWN, KASEY E

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT

12/15/2020:RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF SERVICE

12/11/2020:NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE DEFENDANT N 12/8 BY POSTING

12/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE DEFENDANT N 12/8 BY POSTING

ORDER FROM THE 20-DR-308 AND 20-DR-309 INJUNCTION CASE GIVING DEFENDANT UNTIL DECEMBER 20TH TO REMOVE HER BELONGING FROM THE RESIDENT

12/09/2020:ORDER FROM THE 20-DR-308 AND 20-DR-309 INJUNCTION CASE GIVING DEFENDANT UNTIL DECEMBER 20TH TO REMOVE HER BELONGING FROM THE RESIDENT

15 DAY NOTICE

12/07/2020:15 DAY NOTICE

ISSUED SUMMONS

12/07/2020:ISSUED SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE DEFENDANT N 12/8 BY POSTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM THE 20-DR-308 AND 20-DR-309 INJUNCTION CASE GIVING DEFENDANT UNTIL DECEMBER 20TH TO REMOVE HER BELONGING FROM THE RESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCLERK NOTE (NON IMAGE) PLAINTIFF DELIVERED THE SRV/RTN COPY TO WCSO FOR SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket15 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2007332

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCase 652020CC000048EVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C assigned

    Read MoreRead Less