This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/03/2022 at 23:35:04 (UTC).

REVELL, PATRICIA ANN

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 REVELL, PATRICIA ANN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JILL WALKER, SMITH, J LAYNE, WALKER, JILL CONLON and WALKER, JILL C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JILL WALKER

SMITH, J LAYNE

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BRADFORD, FRED WARREN SR

BRADFORD, MARIAN ELENA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOrder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $200.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005838

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $208.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005837

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER/PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER/PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S IDENTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 9/1/2022 at 0230 PM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCase 652022DR000294DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketJudge: SMITH , J LAYNE assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less