This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/11/2019 at 17:01:24 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS PRATER, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PRATER, KEVIN. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

PRATER, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE DEFENDANT ON 8/17/19 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Judge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/25/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • OTHER PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE DEFENDANT AND EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3326.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2014010465

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Attorney: for to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Case 652019SC000235SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Event Date: 09/25/2019 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERAZA , MANUEL