This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/11/2019 at 17:00:40 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS DAVIS, LANDON S

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVIS, LANDON S. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

DAVIS, LANDON S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE DEFENDANT ON 8/17/19 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Judge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/25/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • OTHER PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2364.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2014010468

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Attorney: for to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Case 652019SC000238SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Event Date: 09/25/2019 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERAZA , MANUEL