This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 07/30/2022 at 23:37:19 (UTC).

OLIVER, TIFFANY AMBER VS BARRETT, DAVID G

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 OLIVER, TIFFANY AMBER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BARRETT, DAVID G. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are J SMITH and SMITH, J LAYNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

J SMITH

SMITH, J LAYNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLIVER, TIFFANY AMBER

Respondent

BARRETT, DAVID G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION WCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 7/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 7/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION WCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEvent DOMESTIC VIOL HRG scheduled on 7/26/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge J SMITH presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketORDER RESETTING & EXTENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 7/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION FROM WCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION WCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEvent DOMESTIC VIOL HRG scheduled on 7/12/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge J SMITH presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION AGAINST STALKING VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S IDENTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONDENT INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCase 652022DR000249DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketJudge: SMITH , J LAYNE assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less