This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/05/2019 at 23:30:46 (UTC).

OLIVER, JAIME YVONNE VS OLIVER, KENNETH SCOTT

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 OLIVER, JAIME YVONNE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against OLIVER, KENNETH SCOTT. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, KEVIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLIVER, JAIME YVONNE

Respondent

OLIVER, KENNETH SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FALKNER, JESSICA LORENE

Respondent Attorney

THURMAN, DONNA CHRISTINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • ANSWER(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Respondent Attorney: D. CHRISTINE THURMAN for to KENNETH SCOTT OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Order STIPULATED MUTUAL LIMITED CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Judge: CARROLL , KEVIN Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Attorney: for to JAIME YVONNE OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • SUMMONS (ISSUED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • PARENTING CLASS CERTIFICATE WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Case 652019DR000259DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less