This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/12/2019 at 23:30:42 (UTC).

NIX, JESSICA JOYCE, SMITH, SHAUN MICHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 NIX, JESSICA JOYCE, SMITH, SHAUN MICHAEL was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SMITH, SHAUN MICHAEL

NIX, JESSICA JOYCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 1904866

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 9/11/2019 at 0915 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER/PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER/PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • PETITIONER'S IDENTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Case 652019DR000265DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Judge: WALKER , JILL C assigned

    Read MoreRead Less