This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 08/28/2019 at 17:00:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS WORRELL, ALLANA

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WORRELL, ALLANA. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WORRELL, ALLANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/07/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 8/12/19 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Judge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/28/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE DEFENDANT AND EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1937.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2014010446

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Attorney: for to MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Case 652019SC000225SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Event Date: 08/28/2019 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA