This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 12/07/2022 at 17:05:46 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SHEPPARD, KRYSTAL

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against SHEPPARD, KRYSTAL. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JILL WALKER, WALKER, JILL CONLON and WALKER, JILL C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JILL WALKER

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SHEPPARD, KRYSTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/02/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $839.04

12/02/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $839.04

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/21/2022 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE TELEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 12/21/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2022008844

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAttorney: for to LVNV FUNDING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $839.04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase 652022SC000271SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL