This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 12/23/2020 at 23:31:50 (UTC).

KRAUSE, REBECCA ANN VS HARRELL, MICHAEL DWAIN JR

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 KRAUSE, REBECCA ANN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HARRELL, MICHAEL DWAIN JR. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FLURY, RONALD WALLACE, RONALD FLURY and FLURY, RONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FLURY, RONALD WALLACE

RONALD FLURY

FLURY, RONALD W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KRAUSE, REBECCA ANN

Respondent

HARRELL, MICHAEL DWAIN JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 12/12/2020 & 12/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 12/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION WCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketEvent DOMESTIC VIOL HRG scheduled on 1/12/2021 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge RONALD FLURY presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (EXPIRES 12/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketOTHER DOCUMENTS FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketFAX CONFIRMATION WCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEvent DOMESTIC VIOL HRG scheduled on 12/8/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge RONALD FLURY presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION ON PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION ON RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPETI FOR INJUNCT FOR PROTECT AGNST DOMESTIC VIOLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S IDENTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase 652020DR000323DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketJudge: FLURY , RONALD W assigned

    Read MoreRead Less