This case was last updated from Wakulla County - Second Judicial Circuit Court on 05/10/2022 at 14:01:57 (UTC).

JONES, CEDRICK VS MURPHY OIL USA INC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 JONES, CEDRICK filed an Other lawsuit against MURPHY OIL USA INC. This case was filed in Wakulla County - Second Judicial Circuit Court, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FLURY, RONALD W and FLURY, RONALD WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FLURY, RONALD W

FLURY, RONALD WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, CEDRICK

Defendant

MURPHY OIL USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNTER, TODD CAMERON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED MURPHY OIL USA, INC

04/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED MURPHY OIL USA, INC

COMPLAINT

04/11/2022:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketANSWER(S) AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF, CEDRICK JONES' COMPLAINT (DEFENDANT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketReturn of Service Served MURPHY OIL USA 4/13/22 (CORP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS disposition on 4/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketSIGNED SUMMONS EMAILED TO FIRM (NON IMAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketJudge: FLURY , RONALD W Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFNENDANT MURPHY OIL USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MURPHY OIL USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MURPHY OIL USA, INC. (PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MURPHY OIL USA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2022002657

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAttorney: for to CEDRICK JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase 652022CA000040CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNTER, TODD CAMERON