This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/08/2019 at 17:01:00 (UTC).

JONES, BARBARA MOORE Et Al VS SCHULZE, HANS J

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 JONES, BARBARA MOORE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCHULZE, HANS J. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES, MICHAEL CLAYTON

JONES, BARBARA MOORE

Defendant

SCHULZE, HANS J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • PLTFS TOOK RTN/SRV PACKET TO JCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/25/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS PT 9/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4595.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Case 652019SC000226SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Judge: WALKER , JILL C assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Event Date: 09/25/2019 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX B

    Read MoreRead Less