This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/03/2019 at 12:00:22 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS DARRELL, SANDERS Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DARRELL, SANDERS. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, JILL C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, JILL C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendants

SANDERS, ANN

DARRELL, SANDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT $7434.29

08/05/2019:COMPLAINT $7434.29

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/05/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2019
  • RESPONSE AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 8/8/19 BY SUB SERVICE TO ANN SANDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE DEFENDANT ON 8/8/19 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Judge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT $7434.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE DEFENDANT SANDERS DARRELL AND EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE DEFENDANT ANN SANDERS AND EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Payment received: $320.00 Receipt Number MX 2014010439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Attorney: for to JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Case 652019CC000083CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH