This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 08/31/2022 at 12:02:34 (UTC).

FORT DEPOIST HOLDING, LLC VS BARRETT, SEAN

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 FORT DEPOIST HOLDING, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BARRETT, SEAN. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL CONLON and WALKER, JILL C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORT DEPOIST HOLDING, LLC

Defendant

BARRETT, SEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSECOND NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED AND CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 8/4/22 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCLERK NOTE (NON IMAGE) forms provided to clerk were almost none ledible

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCLERK NOTE (NON IMAGE) documents filed by process server Mr. Scoefield. srv/rtn copies provided to him for sop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING in provided sase

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketISSUED EVICTIONS SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005571

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase 652022CC000036EVAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less