This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 08/19/2022 at 23:32:06 (UTC).

DOTY, BRITANY A VS HARRELL, CASEY

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 DOTY, BRITANY A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HARRELL, CASEY. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, J LAYNE and J SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, J LAYNE

J SMITH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOTY, BRITANY A

Respondent

HARRELL, CASEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LIEBENHAUT, MATTHEW D

Respondent Attorney

COWHEY, ADAM ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFLORIDA PARENTING CLASS CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING CLASS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 8/25/2022 11:30 AM ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 8/25/2022 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge J SMITH presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketOrder ON EXPEDITED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY CHILD SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketANSWER(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketRespondent Attorney: Adam Robert Cowhey for to CASEY HARRELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER/PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY & FOR RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005275

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney: for to BRITANY A DOTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase 652022DR000277DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWHEY, ADAM ROBERT