This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/02/2022 at 17:07:28 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HILL, HOLLY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HILL, HOLLY. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL C, WALKER, JILL CONLON and JILL WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL C

WALKER, JILL CONLON

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

HOLLY HILL

HILL, HOLLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT HAROLD

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED WITH ZOOM INFORMATION ATTACHED

08/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED WITH ZOOM INFORMATION ATTACHED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/03/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/31/2022 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED AND CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/31/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005664

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAttorney: for to DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED WITH ZOOM INFORMATION ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase 652022SC000155SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKETT BRETT H