This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 08/19/2022 at 17:02:33 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CARLTON, STANLEY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARLTON, STANLEY. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL CONLON, WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CARLTON, STANLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, HAIDAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA ZOOM emailed to atty

07/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED VIA ZOOM emailed to atty

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/31/2022 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 8/11/2022 BY SUB SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/31/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005352

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAttorney: for to DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED VIA ZOOM emailed to atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCase 652022SC000146SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUANG, HAIDAN