This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/08/2019 at 17:00:47 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS DAWKINS, ANTONIO D

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAWKINS, ANTONIO D. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

DAWKINS, ANTONIO D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Judge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/25/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2014010454

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Attorney: for to CITIBANK N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO THE DEFENDANT AND EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY FOR SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • COMPLAINT >$2500 $4119.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Case 652019SC000227SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Event Date: 09/25/2019 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.