This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 09/11/2019 at 17:02:07 (UTC).

CARTER, LINDA VS MILLSAPP, JEREMY

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 CARTER, LINDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MILLSAPP, JEREMY. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Wakulla County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wakulla County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTER, LINDA

Defendant

MILLSAPP, JEREMY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE DEFENDANT ON 8/26/19 BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/25/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • COURT NOTES PLAINTIFF DELIVERED SRV/RTN COPY TO WCSO FOR SOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4923.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 9/25/2019 AT 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 1904854

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Case 652019SC000228SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Judge: WALKER , JILL C assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Event Date: 09/25/2019 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX B

    Read MoreRead Less