This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 08/25/2022 at 17:03:07 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS MORGAN, CHRISTOPHER T

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORGAN, CHRISTOPHER T. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL CONLON, WALKER, JILL C and JILL WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

JILL WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

MORGAN, CHRISTOPHER T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED PTC 8/31/22 EMAILED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

07/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED PTC 8/31/22 EMAILED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/31/2022 09:00; Judge: WALKER, JILL C; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: Michael Thiel Debski for to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/31/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JILL WALKER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005467

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED PTC 8/31/22 EMAILED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase 652022SC000151SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel